Key Information
Governance documents are available to view and download below.
Governors (including those who served in 2023-2024 but are no longer in office) are:
Name | First Appointed | Current Term Start | Term End | Term of office | Appointed by | Business and Pecuniary Interests 2024/2025 | Meetings attended 2023/24 |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raminder Kaur Bahra Governor |
18/03/2014 | 26/11/2021 | 25/11/2024 | 3 years | Trust Board | Employee of NSMAT, Family member on LAB | 3/3 |
Amrik Singh Bhabra Governor |
28/09/2016 | 28/09/2022 | 28/09/2025 | 3 years | Trust Board | Member at Finham Park MAT, Director at ARM Dwellings Ltd, CK Dwellings Ltd, ADECS Maple Ltd, Non Exec Director at Coventry and Warks Chamber of Commerce, Heart of England Community Foundation, University Hospitals Coventry and Warwickshire Charity, Coventry and Warwickshire Chamber of Commerce Training Ltd
|
2/3 |
Elizabeth Hoyt Governor |
20/07/2021 | 20/07/2021 | 19/07/2024 | 3 years | Trust Board | N/A as term of office ended in 23/24 | 2/3 |
Harbinder Kaur Flora Governor |
16/07/2019 | 16/07/2022 | 15/07/2025 | 3 years | Trust Board | Family member on LAB | 3/3 |
Kirtpal Kaur Aujla Governor |
13/09/2018 | 13/09/2024 | 12/09/2027 | 3 years | Trust Board | Family member on NSMAT Board of Trustees | 3/3 |
Matt Higgins Staff governor |
12/02/2021 | 12/02/2021 | 11/02/2024 | 3 years | LGB | N/A as term of office ended in 23/24 | 1/2 |
Sundeep Kaur Riar Staff governor |
12/02/2021 | 12/02/2021 | 11/02/2024 | 3 years | LGB | N/A as term of office ended in 23/24 | 2/2 |
Satbachan Kaur Bahia Chair and Parent Governor |
09/06/2022 | 09/06/2022 | 08/06/2025 | 3 years | LGB | None | 3/3 |
Stephanie Mclean Parent Governor |
01/11/2021 | 01/11/2021 | 01/11/2024 | 3 years | LGB | None | 3/3 |
Gurpreet Kaur Headteacher |
01/09/2020 | 01/09/2020 | Ex officio | Ex officio | Ex officio |
Governor at St Michael's CoE Primary Academy, Family member is NSMAT employee |
3/3 |